Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 166 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17969 Week
» 70985 Month
» 190512 Year
» 3217365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1708 |
18/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47119 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
18/01/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
16/03/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 01/1979 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
16/03/1971 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
09/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 01/1979 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1708 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 470 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
20/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
16/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47119 |
|
|
10/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
07/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
15/05/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47119 |
|
|
12/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Frodingham Depot |
|
|