Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 2 Online
» 615 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6399 Week
» 27788 Month
» 147315 Year
» 3174168 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1705 |
04/11/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47117 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
Class | From | 48 | 04/11/1965 | 47/0 | 03/04/1971 |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Brush Traction, Loughborough |
Works Number |
467 |
To Service |
04/11/1965 to Tinsley (41A) |
Withdrawn |
17/07/1991 |
Time in Service |
25 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
04/11/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/04/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/04/1971 |
|
Reclassified from 48 to 47 |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/11/1965 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
03/04/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/11/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1705 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 467 Allocated to Tinsley (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
14/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Reclassified from 48 to 47 |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47117 |
|
|
17/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47117 |
|
|