Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 4306 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17712 Week
» 70728 Month
» 190255 Year
» 3217108 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1700 |
13/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47112 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/01/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/09/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
14/09/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1700 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 462 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
14/09/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47112 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
24/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
05/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
22/11/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47112 |
|
|
05/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|