Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1274 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7058 Week
» 28447 Month
» 147974 Year
» 3174827 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1693 |
06/12/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47105 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
06/12/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
06/12/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1986 |
vbh |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/12/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1693 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 455 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
27/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
28/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47105 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
13/12/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47105 |
|
|