Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 2981 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17024 Week
» 81978 Month
» 284642 Year
» 3311495 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1687 |
16/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47100 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/11/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 07/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/10/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
10/1971 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
04/10/1975 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1687 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 449 Allocated to Oxley (2B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
20/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
08/12/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47100 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
04/10/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
17/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47100 |
|
|
18/02/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|