Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3011 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16417 Week
» 69433 Month
» 188960 Year
» 3215813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1686 |
08/11/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47099 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
08/11/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/11/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
02/1975 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/11/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1686 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 448 Allocated to Oxley (2B) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47099 |
|
|
02/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/11/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47099 |
|
|
04/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|