Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 466 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18269 Week
» 71285 Month
» 190812 Year
» 3217665 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1674 |
05/04/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47088 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47653 |
08/08/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47808 |
21/07/1989 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
SAMSON |
09/1965 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
05/04/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
07/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
09/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/04/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1980 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
09/1981 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/04/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1674 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/1965 |
Naming |
Named 'SAMSON' at Cardiff Canton depot |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47088 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
07/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
08/08/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47653 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
21/07/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47808 |
|
|
01/09/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47808 |
|
|
04/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|