Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 2765 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16171 Week
» 69187 Month
» 188714 Year
» 3215567 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1672 |
27/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47086 |
01/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47641 |
04/03/1986 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
COLOSSUS |
08/1965 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
27/03/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/03/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/11/1970 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1672 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/1965 |
Naming |
Named 'COLOSSUS' at Cardiff Canton depot |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47086 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
04/03/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47641 |
|
|
01/07/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47641 |
|
|
07/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|