Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3720 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17126 Week
» 70142 Month
» 189669 Year
» 3216522 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1669 |
20/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47084 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47538 |
11/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
PYTHON |
31/03/1966 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
20/03/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
08/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/03/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
08/1976 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xeh |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1669 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/03/1966 |
Naming |
Named 'PYTHON' at Old Oak Common |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47084 but not taken up |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
21/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47538 |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/09/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47538 |
|
|
03/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|