Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 961 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14367 Week
» 67383 Month
» 186910 Year
» 3213763 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1668 |
13/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47083 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47633 |
10/12/1985 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
ORION |
10/1965 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/03/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/03/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1980 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1668 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
10/1965 |
Naming |
Named 'ORION' at Landore depot |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47083 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
03/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
10/12/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47633 |
|
|
01/11/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47633 |
|
|
06/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|