Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 578 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13984 Week
» 67000 Month
» 186527 Year
» 3213380 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1665 |
05/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47080 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47612 |
04/06/1984 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47838 |
03/11/1989 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
TITAN |
03/1966 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
05/03/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/03/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1665 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1966 |
Naming |
Named 'TITAN' at Cardiff Canton depot |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
17/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47080 |
|
|
29/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
04/06/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47612 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
03/11/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47838 |
|
|
01/08/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47838 |
|
|
03/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury |
|
|