Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2505 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15911 Week
» 68927 Month
» 188454 Year
» 3215307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1663 |
20/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47078 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47628 |
18/01/1985 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
20/02/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/02/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
04/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1663 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
08/05/1965 |
Naming |
Named 'SIR DANIEL GOOCH' by Sidney Green, General Secretary of NUR at Paddington station |
|
|
27/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47078 |
|
|
04/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
18/01/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47628 |
|
|
01/05/1997 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47628 |
|
|
03/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|