Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1834 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15240 Week
» 68256 Month
» 187783 Year
» 3214636 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1661 |
13/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47077 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47613 |
18/05/1984 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47840 |
27/11/1989 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
NORTH STAR |
20/03/1965 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
13/02/1965 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/05/2007 |
Time in Service |
42 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/02/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/02/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1661 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
20/03/1965 |
Naming |
Named 'NORTH STAR' by Ray Gunter, Minister of Labour at Paddington Station |
|
|
28/04/1973 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47077 |
|
|
05/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
12/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
18/05/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47613 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
27/11/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47840 |
|
|
01/05/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47840 |
|
|