Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 167 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19078 Week
» 84032 Month
» 286696 Year
» 3313549 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1658 |
12/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47074 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47646 |
08/04/1986 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47852 |
07/02/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/02/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
26/04/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/02/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
26/04/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
08/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1658 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
26/04/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47074 |
|
|
06/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
06/04/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
07/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
01/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
08/04/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47646 |
|
|
07/02/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47852 |
|
|
01/03/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47852 |
|
|
03/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|