Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1657 |
01/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47073 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47537 |
08/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
01/02/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1978 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/02/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
08/1974 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
11/1978 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
02/12/1970 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1657 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47073 but not taken up |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
01/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
08/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47537 |
|
|
11/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|