Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 970 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6754 Week
» 28143 Month
» 147670 Year
» 3174523 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1656 |
01/02/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47072 |
01/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47609 |
17/04/1984 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47834 |
02/08/1989 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
01/02/1965 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/2004 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
01/02/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/02/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/1976 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/02/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1656 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
12/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47072 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
10/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
17/04/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47609 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
02/08/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47834 |
|
|
01/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47834 |
|
|