Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 582 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14625 Week
» 79579 Month
» 282243 Year
» 3309096 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1649 |
02/01/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47065 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47535 |
04/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
02/01/1965 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
04/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
08/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/01/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
04/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
08/1976 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/01/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1649 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
30/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47065 but not taken up |
|
|
23/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47535 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/02/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47535 |
|
|
04/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Old Oak Common MPD |
|
|