Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 482 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 26516 Week
» 125161 Month
» 327825 Year
» 3354678 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1646 |
31/12/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47062 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47545 |
11/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
31/12/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
01/1979 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
02/1979 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/12/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
01/1979 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xeh |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1646 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47062 but not taken up |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
28/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
11/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47545 |
|
|
01/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
02/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|