Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 256 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6040 Week
» 27429 Month
» 146956 Year
» 3173809 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1643 |
19/12/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47059 |
26/09/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47631 |
29/11/1985 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
19/12/1964 to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/2000 |
Time in Service |
35 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
19/12/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
05/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
12/1983 |
|
Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/12/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
11/1974 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
05/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/12/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1643 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
26/09/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47059 |
|
|
13/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
09/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
07/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
12/1983 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
29/11/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47631 |
|
|
01/03/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47631 |
|
|