Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2569 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15975 Week
» 68991 Month
» 188518 Year
» 3215371 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1636 |
10/12/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47482 |
06/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
10/12/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
09/1976 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/12/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
06/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
09/1976 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/12/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1636 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
06/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47482 |
|
|
09/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
05/01/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (IS) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
20/10/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47482 |
|
|
06/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|