Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 730 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18533 Week
» 71549 Month
» 191076 Year
» 3217929 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1631 |
31/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47049 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
31/10/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/10/1964 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1986 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
25/10/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1631 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
29/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
02/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
15/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
24/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
04/09/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
19/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47049 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
28/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
01/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by English, Welsh & Scottish Railways: Wigan |
|
|
21/01/2000 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47049 |
|
|