Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3037 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16443 Week
» 69459 Month
» 188986 Year
» 3215839 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1624 |
04/10/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47043 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47566 |
11/05/1980 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
04/10/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1975 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/10/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/1986 |
vbh |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/10/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1624 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47043 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
12/1975 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/05/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47566 |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/11/1996 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47566 |
|
|
03/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|