Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 377 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18180 Week
» 71196 Month
» 190723 Year
» 3217576 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1622 |
on |
27/06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
16xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
381 |
To Service |
Mon 27/06/1950 to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1964 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 11 mths , 19 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1950 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1622 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
14/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Slough (81B) |
|
|
15/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1622 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|