Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1296 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7080 Week
» 28469 Month
» 147996 Year
» 3174849 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1619 |
12/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47038 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47564 |
31/07/1980 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
12/09/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Withdrawn |
01/11/2003 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
12/09/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/02/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/09/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
08/02/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1619 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
11/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
13/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47038 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
31/07/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47564 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/11/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47564 |
|
|