Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 622 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14028 Week
» 67044 Month
» 186571 Year
» 3213424 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1617 |
04/09/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47036 |
03/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47562 |
31/12/1979 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
04/09/1964 to Toton (16A) |
Status |
In Service |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
04/09/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 02/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/09/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/09/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1617 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Toton (16A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
08/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
10/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/04/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
09/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
16/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47036 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IM) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
31/12/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47562 |
|
|