Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 801 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18604 Week
» 71620 Month
» 191147 Year
» 3218000 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1615 |
29/08/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47035 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47594 |
15/09/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/08/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/06/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
30/06/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/08/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
14/06/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
30/06/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
22/06/1970 |
Severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/08/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1615 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
20/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
13/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47035 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
15/09/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47594 |
|
|