Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 360 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18163 Week
» 71179 Month
» 190706 Year
» 3217559 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1610 |
13/08/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47031 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47560 |
06/07/1980 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47832 |
19/06/1989 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
13/08/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/06/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
30/06/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1979 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/08/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
14/06/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
30/06/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1979 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/08/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1610 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
20/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
31/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47031 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1979 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
06/07/1980 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47560 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
19/06/1989 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47832 |
|
|