Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 722 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14128 Week
» 67144 Month
» 186671 Year
» 3213524 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1606 |
29/07/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47029 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47635 |
10/01/1986 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
29/07/1964 to Landore (87E) |
Withdrawn |
01/02/2004 |
Time in Service |
39 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/07/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
30/05/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
25/03/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1984 |
|
Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/07/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
30/05/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
25/03/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
07/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/07/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1606 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
31/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/05/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
25/03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
31/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
02/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47029 |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
07/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
11/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
06/1984 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified for One Man Operation |
|
|
10/01/1986 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47635 |
|
|
01/02/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47635 |
|
|