Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18135 Week
» 71151 Month
» 190678 Year
» 3217531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1600 |
30/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47472 |
01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
30/06/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
29/03/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
29/03/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
29/03/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
01/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1600 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
07/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
01/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47472 |
|
|
13/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
19/04/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47472 |
|
|
05/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|