Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 2997 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16403 Week
» 69419 Month
» 188946 Year
» 3215799 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1598 |
29/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47471 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/06/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
07/1972 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1598 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
18/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
07/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
12/08/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47471 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
29/06/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
31/12/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47471 |
|
|
05/02/2005 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Ron Hull Jr.: Rotherham |
|
|