Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1814 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19617 Week
» 72633 Month
» 192160 Year
» 3219013 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1597 |
22/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47026 |
05/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47597 |
15/12/1983 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/06/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 09/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
01/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1597 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
22/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
09/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47026 |
|
|
21/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
08/02/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
15/12/1983 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47597 |
|
|
01/01/2003 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47597 |
|
|
05/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|