Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 753 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14796 Week
» 79750 Month
» 282414 Year
» 3309267 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1591 |
05/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47024 |
02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47557 |
31/12/1979 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
05/06/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/05/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
14/06/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
31/05/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
14/06/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 10/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xbh |
Dual brakes, Steam heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1591 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
31/05/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47024 |
|
|
07/09/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
09/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
31/12/1979 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47557 |
|
|
06/09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (TO) |
|
|
01/11/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/04/2002 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47557 |
|
|
05/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|