Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4047 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17453 Week
» 70469 Month
» 189996 Year
» 3216849 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1588 |
29/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47023 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47543 |
12/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
29/05/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/07/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
12/07/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1588 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
15/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
07/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
14/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
12/07/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47023 but not taken up |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
12/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
12/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47543 |
|
|
21/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
15/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
23/04/1998 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|
25/08/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47543 |
|
|