16/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1585 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
19/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
30/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
22/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/02/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) fitted |
|
|
09/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47022 but not taken up |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
09/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47542 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
11/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/11/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
01/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
03/04/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47542 |
|
|
03/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: at Stratford MPD |
|
|