Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 263 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21297 Week
» 119942 Month
» 322606 Year
» 3349459 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1584 |
16/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47021 |
|
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47531 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/05/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 02/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
14/06/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
30/09/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
14/06/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
30/09/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1584 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Landore (87E) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
28/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
31/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
13/05/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87A) |
|
|
1973 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 47021 but not taken up |
|
|
30/09/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
05/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47531 |
|
|
24/08/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) |
|
|
05/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (BS) |
|
|
01/07/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47531 |
|
|
04/2006 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Crewe DMD |
|
|