Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1473 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14879 Week
» 67895 Month
» 187422 Year
» 3214275 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1581 |
16/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47461 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
16/05/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/06/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
10/06/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
10/06/1972 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1581 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/06/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/10/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47461 |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
28/03/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47461 |
|
|
17/12/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|