Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2267 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15673 Week
» 68689 Month
» 188216 Year
» 3215069 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1579 |
01/05/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47459 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
01/05/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
16/11/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/05/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
16/11/1968 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1974 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/06/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/05/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1579 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
16/11/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/02/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47459 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
10/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
25/03/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47459 |
|
|
07/05/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|