Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2181 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19984 Week
» 73000 Month
» 192527 Year
» 3219380 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1575 |
20/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47455 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
20/04/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
17/12/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
17/12/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
02/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1575 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
07/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
11/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
17/12/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
23/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47455 |
|
|
15/03/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47455 |
|
|
06/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|