Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1618 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19421 Week
» 72437 Month
» 191964 Year
» 3218817 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1571 |
04/04/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47453 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
04/04/1964 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
02/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/04/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
02/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/04/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1571 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
25/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47453 |
|
|
15/12/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47453 |
|
|
04/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|