Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3792 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17198 Week
» 70214 Month
» 189741 Year
» 3216594 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1567 |
28/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47450 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/03/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
07/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
07/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
13/07/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
07/1973 |
ve |
Vacuum brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
13/07/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1567 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
07/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
13/07/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47450 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
03/05/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47450 |
|
|
28/05/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|