Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1028 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6812 Week
» 28201 Month
» 147728 Year
» 3174581 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1566 |
23/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47449 |
03/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
47 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
23/03/1964 to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
Withdrawn |
14/05/1993 |
Time in Service |
29 yrs, 1 mth , 21 dys |
Cut Up |
23/11/1993 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
23/03/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
30/03/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
03/1973 |
ve |
Vacuum brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
30/03/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1566 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
23/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
27/01/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
30/03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47449 |
|
|
14/05/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47449 |
|
|
23/11/1993 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|