Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3235 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16641 Week
» 69657 Month
» 189184 Year
» 3216037 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1565 |
23/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47448 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
23/03/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
05/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
22/05/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
05/1973 |
ve |
Vacuum brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
22/05/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1565 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
14/06/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
24/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
07/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
22/05/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47448 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
17/05/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47448 |
|
|
14/03/1996 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|