Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 2222 Today
» 3791 Yesterday
» 11166 Week
» 2222 Month
» 348646 Year
» 3375499 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1562 |
14/03/1964 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/03/1964 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1562 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/06/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1562 |
|
|
09/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|