Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2291 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20094 Week
» 73110 Month
» 192637 Year
» 3219490 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1559 |
14/03/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47443 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
14/03/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
06/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
28/06/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/03/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
06/1973 |
ve |
Vacuum brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
28/06/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/03/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1559 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
24/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
21/04/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
28/06/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47443 |
|
|
03/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
01/10/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47443 |
|
|
30/11/1996 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Crewe Works |
|
|