Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 940 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18743 Week
» 71759 Month
» 191286 Year
» 3218139 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1551 |
31/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47529 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
31/01/1964 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
19/04/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
04/1973 |
vd |
Vacuum brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
19/04/1973 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1551 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
15/04/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
24/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
10/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
04/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
19/04/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47529 |
|
|
02/02/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47529 |
|
|
30/04/1987 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|