Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 888 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18691 Week
» 71707 Month
» 191234 Year
» 3218087 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1550 |
25/01/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47435 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
25/01/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/03/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
18/11/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/01/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
04/03/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
18/11/1972 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/01/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1550 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
04/03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
29/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
18/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47435 |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
15/03/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47435 |
|
|
22/12/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|