Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2269 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20072 Week
» 73088 Month
» 192615 Year
» 3219468 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1542 |
20/09/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47430 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
20/09/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/04/1970 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
16/09/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/09/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
04/04/1970 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
16/09/1972 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
by 06/1986 |
xdh |
Dual brakes, Dual heat, Headlight |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
04/10/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/09/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1542 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 435 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
21/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
16/09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47430 |
|
|
29/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
02/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
06/1986 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
21/02/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47430 |
|
|
05/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|