Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1660 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15066 Week
» 68082 Month
» 187609 Year
» 3214462 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1536 |
22/08/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47428 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/08/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
08/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
08/1972 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1536 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 429 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/10/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
02/09/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47428 |
|
|
25/01/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47428 |
|
|
08/1990 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|