Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 1 Online
» 305 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18108 Week
» 71124 Month
» 190651 Year
» 3217504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1535 |
22/08/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47427 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/08/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
01/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1973 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
01/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
01/1973 |
xe |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/08/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Sightings
Report Date |
Title |
Location |
Report |
Headcode |
Reference |
01/03/1975 |
Eastfield shed visit |
Eastfield |
On shed |
|
Bruce Strong, Facebook |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1535 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 428 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
28/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
01/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
01/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47427 |
|
|
07/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
05/02/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47427 |
|
|
03/04/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|