Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2947 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16353 Week
» 69369 Month
» 188896 Year
» 3215749 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1527 |
03/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47423 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
03/07/1963 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
28/11/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
28/11/1972 |
|
Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
28/11/1972 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
01/07/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1527 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 420 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
03/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
29/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
28/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
28/11/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Electric Train Heating (ETH) Fitted |
|
|
09/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47423 |
|
|
15/05/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
27/07/1992 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47423 |
|
|
04/1997 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MRJ Philips: at Old Oak Common TMD |
|
|